Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Lawson | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |