Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023