Senate | 04/11/2023 | Failed in Committee - Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 14 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims, Sneed, Olsen, Caldwell (Trey), Humphrey, Randleman, Sterling, Wolfley | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Lepak |