Senate | 04/06/2023 | Failed in Committee - General Government | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Culver |