House
|
04/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|