Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Sneed |