House
|
05/02/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/02/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman, ODonnell, Luttrell, Townley, Hardin, Osburn, Humphrey, Manger, Olsen, Williams, Pae, West (Tammy), Cornwell, Dobrinski, Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Sneed
|
|
|