Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Grego |