Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023