Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023