Senate | 04/03/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Maynard | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Staires |