Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Marti |