House
|
05/30/2024
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Measure returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Vetoed 04/29/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Marti
|
|
|