Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1713 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023