House
|
05/30/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Townley
|
|
|