House
|
05/20/2024
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Garvin, Stewart, Rogers, Weaver, Seifried, Young
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Manger
|
|
|