House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Williams
|
|
|