Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams, Boles, Kendrix
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Remove Representative Williams as principal House author and substitute with Representative Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Williams
|
|
|