House
|
04/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Remove Representative Osburn as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hays
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|