Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Conley |