Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1843 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023