Senate | 03/26/2024 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Kerbs |