Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1926 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023