House
|
05/25/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Notice to reconsider waived
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 26
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCall
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 31
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stewart
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|