House
|
02/27/2024
|
Approved by Governor 02/27/2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
coauthored by Luttrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Ford
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Kane
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hardin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Smith
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Manger
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Rick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Talley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stinson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Duel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Maynard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Cantrell
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Osburn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Grego
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Culver
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Gann
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative May
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative George
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hays
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Deck
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Menz
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Provenzano
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Bullard; authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|