House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 7 Nays: 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|