Senate | 04/12/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Coleman | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Newton |