House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stewart
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Maynard
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Gollihare
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Olsen
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley, Hilbert, Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|