House
|
05/22/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|