House | 03/22/2023 | Motion expired | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Roberts | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 72 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Roberts | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |