Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Remove Representative Hardin as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, McEntire | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hardin |