Senate | 04/08/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) McEntire | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 34; Ayes: 51 Nays: 34 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, McEntire, Lawson, McDugle, Bennett | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Echols |