Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Munson | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 32 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Hefner, Deck | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Pae |