House | 03/06/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Schreiber, Menz, Talley | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Remove Representative Pae as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Withdrawn from General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Pae | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |