House
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 4; Ayes: 58 Nays: 27
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|