Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Stewart; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 37
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stewart (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boatman, Hill
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Burns
|
|
|