Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2263 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/12/2023

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2263 	By: Sterling, Fugate, Menz and 
Rosecrants of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Rogers and Boren of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Turnpik e Authority; 
amending 69 O.S. 2021, Section 1703, which relates to 
the creation of the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority; 
modifying membership of the Authority ; modifying term 
length; modifying actions regarding removal of 
appointive members; prohibiting members from 
participating in certain votes; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Oklahoma Turnpike Authority 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     69 O.S. 2021, Section 1703 , is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 1703. A.  There is hereby created a body corporate and 
politic to be known as the "Oklahoma Turnpike Authority" and by that 
name the Authority may sue and be sued, and plead and be impleaded.  
The Authority is here by constituted an instrumentality of the state, 
and the exercise by the Authority of the powers conferred by this 
act in the construction, operation, and maintenance of turnpike 
projects shall be deemed and held to be an essential governmental 
function of the state with all the attributes th ereof.  Provided, 
however, the Turnpike Authority is authorized to carry and shall 
carry liability insurance to the same extent and in the same manner  ENR. H. B. NO. 2263 	Page 2 
as the Transportation Commission, and in addition thereto it shall 
be subject to the workers' compensation laws of the state the same 
as a private construction project. 
 
B. The Oklahoma Turnpike Authority shall consist of the 
Governor, who shall be a member ex officio, and six (6) members to 
be appointed by the Governor, by and with the consent of the two (2) 
members to be appointed by the Governor, two (2) members to be 
appointed by the Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives , 
and two (2) members to be appointed by the President Pro Tempore of 
the Oklahoma State Senate.  The appointive members shall be 
residents of the state, and shall have been qualified electors 
therein for a period of at least one (1) year next prece ding their 
appointment.  One appointive member shall be appointed from each of 
six districts of the state, such districts to include t he area as 
follows: 
 
District 1.  Oklahoma, Canadian, Cleveland, McClain and Garvin 
Counties. 
 
District 2.  Washington, Nowa ta, Craig, Ottawa, Rogers, Mayes, 
Delaware, Wagoner, Cherokee, Adair, Okmulgee, Osage, Muskogee, 
Sequoyah, McIntosh and Haskell Coun ties. 
 
District 3.  Coal, Logan, Payne, Lincoln, Creek, Okfuskee, 
Pottawatomie, Seminole, Hughes and Pontotoc Counties. 
 
District 4.  Kay, Pawnee, Garfield, Noble, Tulsa, Woods, 
Woodward, Major, Alfalfa and Grant Counties. 
 
District 5.  Cimarron, Grady, Te xas, Beaver, Harper, Elli s, 
Roger Mills, Dewey, Custer, Caddo, Washita, Beckham, Harmon, 
Stephens, Jefferson, Greer, Kiowa, Jac kson, Tillman, Comanche, 
Cotton, Kingfisher and Blaine Counties. 
 
District 6.  Carter, Love, Murray , Johnston, Marshall, Atoka, 
Bryan, Pittsburg, Latimer, Le Flore, Pushmataha, Choctaw and 
McCurtain Counties. 
 
The members of the Authority appointed shall continue in office 
for terms expiring as follows:  District 1, July 1, 1968; District 
2, July 1, 1971; District 3, July 1, 1972; D istrict 4, July 1, 1973; 
District 5, July 1, 1974; District 6, July 1, 1975.  Provided, that 
appointive The Governor shall appoint the members from Districts 1 
and 2.  The Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives shall  ENR. H. B. NO. 2263 	Page 3 
appoint the members from Districts 3 and 4.  The President P ro 
Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate shall appoint the members from 
Districts 5 and 6. Appointive members serving on the Oklahoma 
Turnpike Authority created by 69 O.S. 1961, Section 653, when this 
act becomes on the effective date of this act shall continue to 
serve as members of the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority created by this 
section, for the remainder of the original terms for which they were 
appointed, unless sooner remove d by the Governor appointing 
authority for their District.  The successor of Thereafter, each 
appointive member shall be appointed in the manner set forth by this 
section for a term of eight (8) six (6) years, except that any 
person appointed to fill a vacancy shall be appoi nted to serve only 
for the unexpired term, and a member of t he Authority shall be 
eligible for reappointment.  Each appointed me mber of the Authority 
before entering upon the duties of office shall take an oath as 
provided by Section 1 of Article XV of the Constitution of the State 
of Oklahoma.  Any appointive memb er of the Authority may be removed 
by the Governor at any time with or without cause by the appointing 
authority. 
 
C.  The Authority shall elect one of the appointed members as 
chairperson and anot her as vice-chairperson, and shall also elect a 
Secretary and Treasurer.  A majority of the members of the Authority 
shall constitute a quorum and the vote of a majo rity of the members 
shall be necessary for any action taken by the Authority.  No 
vacancy in the membership of the Authority shall impair the right o f 
a quorum to exercise all the rights and perform all the duties of 
the Authority. 
 
D.  Appointed members of the Authority shall be prohibited from 
voting on any issue in which the member has a dir ect financial 
interest. 
 
D. E. Before the issuance of any turnpike revenue bonds under 
the provisions of this act, each appointed member of the Authority 
shall execute a surety bond in the penal sum of Twenty -five Thousand 
Dollars ($25,000.00) and the secretary and treasurer shall ex ecute a 
surety bond in the penal sum of One Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($100,000.00), each such surety bond to be conditioned upon the 
faithful performance of the duties of the office, to be executed by 
a surety company authorized to transact business in the State of 
Oklahoma as surety and to be approved by the Governor and filed in 
the office of the Secretary of State. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2263 	Page 4 
E. F. The members of the Authority shall not be entitled to 
compensation for their services, but each me mber shall be reimbursed 
for actual expenses necessarily incurred in the performance of the 
duties of such member.  All expenses incurred in carrying out the 
provisions of this act shall be payable solely from funds provided 
under the authority of this act and no liability or obligation sha ll 
be incurred by the Authority hereunder beyond the extent to which 
monies shall have been provided under the authority of this act. 
 
F. G. Whenever the terms "Oklahoma Transportation Authority", 
"Transportation Authority" or "Authority", when used in reference to 
the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority, appear in the Oklahoma Statutes, 
such terms shall mean the Oklahoma Turnpike Authority. 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2263 	Page 5 
Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of May, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 25th day of April, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _ ______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the Stat e of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________