Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hilbert |