Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Staires
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Waldron
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Returned from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Received request from House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House requested return
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Schreiber
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Menz
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Johns, Hardin, Lowe (Dick), Roberts, Davis, Rosecrants, Fetgatter, Deck, West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Hasenbeck, Moore
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Hilbert
|
|
|