House
|
05/19/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/19/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boatman
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Remove Representative Boatman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Archer
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|