Senate | 04/10/2023 | Failed in Committee - Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |