Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 17 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Dempsey |