House
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, Rader, Howard, Kidd, Woods
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|