House
|
05/25/2023
|
Remove Senator Rosino as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Treat
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rosino, Daniels, Treat, McCortney, Weaver, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
HC's named: Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hays
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Kannady
|
|
|