Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative May |