House | 02/19/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hill | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |