Senate | 04/04/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Lepak |