Senate | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 12 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred to Government Modernization and Technology | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Pittman |