Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Humphrey |