Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Humphrey
|
|
|